Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
State Of Delaware, filed a(n) General Labor - Labor and Employment case against East Coast Nitros Inc, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2015 |
CategoryDepartment Of Labor Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Labor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 7, 2015 JUDGMENT SATISFIED ON 8-6-2015 ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 57665963 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 7, 2015 DEPT OF LABOR LETTER RETURNED TO SENDER UNCLAIMED ON 4-6-2015 ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 57028699 LETTER |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 3, 2015 CERTIFIED DEPARTMENT OF LABOR LETTER SENT OUT ON 3-2-2015 ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 56844965 LETTER |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DEPARTMENT OF LABOR SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 1, 2015 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: EAST COAST NITROS INC JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $7883.93 INIT FILING DEPART OF LABOR |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 1, 2015 CERTIFICATE OF INDEBTEDNESS FILED. JUDGEMENT AMOUNT $7,883.93 ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 56840069 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.