Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dahlink Financial Corporation, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Kingery, Clark C, against Brodzinski Iii, Theodore B, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2015 |
CategoryJustice Of The Peace Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 3, 2016 CORPORATION OR BUSINESS WITHOUT A REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 11-22-2016 12:26 FLOOR COATINGS ETC INC ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 59896133 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 15, 2016 WRIT ISSUED AND CHECK FOR ATTACHMENT FIFA SENT TO SHERIFF ON 11-17-2016 ACCEPTED BY: SD TRANSACTION ID: 59831110 WRIT ISSUED |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: ATTACHMENT FI FA DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 3, 2016 WRIT FOR ATTACHMENT FIFA. PRAECIPE FOR ATTACHMENT FIFA. ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 59779114 ATTACHMENT FIFA |
|
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING JUSTICE OF THE PEACE COURT SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 27, 2015 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: THEODORE B BRODZINSKI JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $2784.74 INIT FILING JP COURT |
|
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 27, 2015 CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT FROM THE JUSTICE OF THE PEACE COURT NO. 13 TO TRANSFER JUDGMENT TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW CASTLE COUNTY. ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 56831085 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.