Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chandler, Richard F, filed a(n) Plavix case represented by Brown, Daniel J, Kelly, Michael P, Coffey, Diane M, against Sanofi Us Services Inc, Sanofi Aventis Us Llc, Sanofi Synthelabo Inc, Bristol Myers Squibb Co, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, PLAVIX presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2015 |
CategoryPlavix |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 15, 2015 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SANOFI US SERVICES INC. WHICH WAS SERVED ON AUGUST 13, 2015 AT 2:33 PM ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 57848849 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 12, 2015 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 08-07-2015 12:55 SANOFI SYNTHELABO INC ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 57681936 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 12, 2015 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 08-07-2015 10:00 BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 57685913 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 12, 2015 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 08-07-2015 12:55 SANOFI-AVENTIS US, LLC ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 57681938 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
REMOVED: DISTRICT COURT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 10, 2015 REMOVED: DISTRICT COURT |
|
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 6, 2015 (4) WRITS ISSUED ON 8-5-15. ACCEPTED BY: MCS TRANSACTION ID: 57655546 WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 8, 2015 DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT WITH ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE EXHIBIT A TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 57656046 NOTICE |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 4, 2015 COMPLAINT FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES NEW CASTLE COUNTY PRAECIPE NEW CASTLE COUNTY SUMMONS 3104 PRAECIPE 3104 SUMMONS CIS FORM ACCEPTED BY: ELS TRANSACTION ID: 57639134 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.