Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Stonefield Maintenance Corp, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Hogan, Daniel K, against Altschul, Chris C, Matson-Altschul, Terri L, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JURDEN, JAN R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2015 |
CategoryDebt / Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 16, 2016 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: TERRI L MATSON-ALTSCHUL CHRIS C ALTSCHUL JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: PRINCIPAL BALANCE $249.00 PLUS INTEREST FROM 1/31/15 THROUGH 11/9/16 AT $0.08 PER DIEM: $51.84 PLUS INTEREST FROM 11/10/16 AT $0.08 PER DIEM COSTS: $343.72 PRE-JUDGMENT LEGAL FFEES @ 20%: $60.17 FOR A TOTAL AS OF 11/9/16: $704.73 TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT= $249.00 PLAINTIFF'S DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS, CHRIS C. ALTSCHUL AND TERRI L. MATSON-ALTSCHUL AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 59806119 DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 13, 2015 PERSONALLY SERVED ON 08-10-2015 12:17 TERRI L MATSON ALTSCHUL ACCEPTED BY: RAM TRANSACTION ID: 57689139 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 13, 2015 SERVED CHRIS C ALTSCHUL BY LEAVING COPY WITH TERRI ALTSCHUL, CO-OCCUPANT ON 08-10-2015 12:17 CHRIS C ALTSCHUL ACCEPTED BY: RAM TRANSACTION ID: 57689138 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 6, 2015 2 WRITS ISSUED ON 08-05-2015 ACCEPTED BY: RAM TRANSACTION ID: 57656618 WRIT ISSUED |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DEBT / BREACH OF CONTRACT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 2, 2015 INIT FILING DEBT/BREACH CONT |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 2, 2015 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SUMMONS EXHIBIT A - FAIR DEBT COLLECTIONS DISCLOSURE EXHIBIT B - MAINTENANCE DECLARATION EXHIBIT C - BYLAWS EXHIBIT D - 2015 INVOICE EXHIBIT E - DEMAND LETTER AND CERTIFIED MAIL ACCEPTED BY: ELS TRANSACTION ID: 57631403 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.