Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Rmd Instruments Corp, filed a(n) Ccld: Complex Com Lit Division case represented by Enerio, Patricia L, Donimirski, Melissa N, against Dilon Technologies Inc, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JURDEN, JAN R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2015 |
CategoryCcld: Complex Com Lit Division |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 2, 2015 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: RAM TRANSACTION ID: 57005320 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 13, 2015 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME TO PROCTOR HEYMAN ENERIO LLP WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: RAM TRANSACTION ID: 56910411 NOTICE |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING CCLD - COMPLEX COMMERCIAL LITIGATION DIVISION DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 3, 2015 INIT FILING CCLD |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 3, 2015 PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT SUMMONS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT DILON TECHNOLOGIES, INC. EXHIBIT A TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT EXHIBIT B TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT EXHIBIT C TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT EXHIBIT D TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT LETTER DATED FEBRUARY 27, 2015 TO PRESIDENT JUDGE JURDEN FROM MELISSA DONIMIRSKI REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 56842853 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.