Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fulton, Kathryn, Fulton, Thomas E, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Balick, Adam L, Bocchino, Amaryah K, Bowers Ii, Allen D, Cincilla, Jason A, Costello, Kelly A, (total of 19) See All against Air & Liquid Systems Corp, C B S Corp, Defense Coordinating Counsel, General Electric Co, Georgia Pacific Llc, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, ASBESTOS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2015 |
CategoryAsbestos |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 19, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS ORDER SIGNED - CASE CLOSED (ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE) ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 61479440 COURT DISMISSAL |
|
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
OMNIBUS MOTION DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 29, 2017 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE, TO BE PRESENTED TO THE COURT AT THE NEXT OMNIBUS MOTION HEARING DATE ON DECEMBER 14, 2017. ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 61396880 OMNIBUS MOTION |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 13, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR REVIEW AND APPROVAL OF AGREEMENTS AND STIPULATIONS MODIFYING APPLICABLE MASTER TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND OR STANDING ORDER NO. 1 DEADLINES) ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 61234220 ORDER |
|
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 5, 2017 MOTION FOR REVIEW AND APPROVAL OF AGREEMENTS AND STIPULATIONS MODIFYING APPLICABLE MASTER TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND OR STANDING ORDER NO. 1 DEADLINES NOTICE OF MOTION FOR REVIEW AND APPROVAL OF AGREEMENTS AND STIPULATIONS MODIFYING APPLICABLE MASTER TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND OR STANDING ORDER NO. 1 DEADLINES, TO BE PRESENTED TO THE COURT ON OCTOBER 5, 2017 AT 2:30 PM. ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR REVIEW AND APPROVAL OF AGREEMENTS AND STIPULATIONS MODIFYING APPLICABLE MASTER TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND OR STANDING ORDER NO. 1 DEADLINES ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 61191627 MOTION |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 20, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEM CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS BASED UPON PLAINTIFFS' NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) ACCEPTED BY: ASA TRANSACTION ID: 61131993 ORDER |
|
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 13, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR REVIEW AND APPROVAL OF AGREEMENTS AND STIPULATIONS MODIFYING APPLICABLE MASTER TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND OR STANDING ORDER NO. 1 DEADLINES) ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 61097645 ORDER |
|
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 7, 2017 MOTION FOR REVIEW AND APPROVAL OF AGREEMENTS AND STIPULATIONS MODIFYING APPLICABLE MASTER TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND OR STANDING ORDER NO. 1 DEADLINES NOTICE OF MOTION FOR REVIEW AND APPROVAL OF AGREEMENTS AND STIPULATIONS MODIFYING APPLICABLE MASTER TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND OR STANDING ORDER NO. 1 DEADLINES, TO BE PRESENTED TO THE COURT ON SEPTEMBER 7, 2017 AT 2:30 PM. ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR REVIEW AND APPROVAL OF AGREEMENTS AND STIPULATIONS MODIFYING APPLICABLE MASTER TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND OR STANDING ORDER NO. 1 DEADLINES ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 61070852 MOTION |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 23, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON PLAINTIFF'S DECISION NOT TO OPPOSE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION) ACCEPTED BY: AJD TRANSACTION ID: 61017985 ORDER |
|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 23, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY) ACCEPTED BY: AJD TRANSACTION ID: 61019044 ORDER |
|
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 18, 2017 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS BASED UPON PLAINTIFFS' DECISION NOT TO OPPOSE SUMMARY JUDGMENT) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 60998702 ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.