Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jones, Javon, Jones, Larissa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sanfrancesco, Megan, Allen, Rachel D, Fredricks, Joel H, Janczyk, Peter K, against Rosauri Builders & Remodelers Inc, Rosauri, Justin, Emerson, Lennard, New Castle County, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with ROCANELLI, ANDREA L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2015 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JULY 22, 2016 ORDER SIGNED BY: ROCANELLI, ANDREA L SO ORDERED (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE.) ACCEPTED BY: IC TRANSACTION ID: 59304372 ORDER |
|
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JULY 21, 2016 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: IC TRANSACTION ID: 59295849 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
________________ SCHEDULED, REMOVED FROM CALENDAR DATE DOCKETED: JULY 21, 2016 EVENT SCHEDULED AND REMOVED |
|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 21, 2016 ORDER SIGNED BY: ROCANELLI, ANDREA L LETTER TO COUNSEL DATED JULY 18, 2016 FROM THE HONORABLE ANDREA L. ROCANELLI REQUESTING THAT COUNSEL FILE A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL FOR THE TWO REMAINING DEFENDANTS OR FILE A STATUS REPORT CLARIFYING WHETHER THE CASE WILL PROCEED TO TRIAL AGAINST THESE DEFENDANTS, NO LATER THAN AUGUST 19, 2016. ACCEPTED BY: IC TRANSACTION ID: 59290840 LETTER |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 17, 2016 ORDER SIGNED BY: ROCANELLI, ANDREA L SO ORDERED (STIPULATION OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS LENNARD EMERSON AND NEW CASTLE COUNTY.) ACCEPTED BY: IC TRANSACTION ID: 59154600 ORDER |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
PARTIAL DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 17, 2016 STIPULATION OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS LENNARD EMERSON AND NEW CASTLE COUNTY. ACCEPTED BY: IC TRANSACTION ID: 59150857 PARTIAL DISMISSAL |
|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 4, 2016 ORDER SIGNED BY: ROCANELLI, ANDREA L LETTER TO COUNSEL DATED MAY 2, 2016 FROM THE HONORABLE ANDREA L. ROCANELLI ACCEPTED BY: IC TRANSACTION ID: 58939854 LETTER |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 25, 2016 ORDER SIGNED BY: ROCANELLI, ANDREA L SO ORDERED (STIPULATION & [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND PLAINTIFF'S & DEFENDANTS' EXPERT REPORT DEADLINES) ACCEPTED BY: IC TRANSACTION ID: 58762848 ORDER |
|
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 24, 2016 STIPULATION & [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND PLAINTIFF'S & DEFENDANTS' EXPERT REPORT DEADLINES ACCEPTED BY: IC TRANSACTION ID: 58758195 STIPULATION |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 27, 2016 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR SETTING HEARING DATE FOR MONDAY, APRIL 18, 2016 AT 8:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: IC TRANSACTION ID: 58631447 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.