Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ledet, Shane, Ledet, Tracey, filed a(n) Pelvic Mesh case represented by Shields, Colleen D, Reale, Krista M, Leoni, Robert J, against Boston Scientific Corporation, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, PELVIC MESH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDGE, PELVIC MESH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2015 |
CategoryPelvic Mesh |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 14, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, PELVIC MESH SO ORDERED (LETTER CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL - CASE CLOSED) ACCEPTED BY: NG TRANSACTION ID: 67613282 COURT DISMISSAL |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 14, 2022 LETTER CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL - CASE CLOSED ACCEPTED BY: OA TRANSACTION ID: 67233019 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 26, 2017 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITHDRAWING KRISTA R. SAMIS AND ENTERING ALEXANDRA D. ROGIN OF ECKERT SEAMANS CHERIN & MELLOTT LLC FOR BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 61144570 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 9, 2016 CROSS-NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED ORAL DEPOSTION OF MICHELLE BERRY TO BE TAKEN ON DECEMBER 15, 2016 AT 9:30 A.M. WITH ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 59924471 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 24, 2015 BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 56799723 ANSWER |
|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 5, 2015 (1) WRIT ISSUED ON JANUARY 26, 2015 ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 56717689 WRIT ISSUED |
|
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 1, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF COLLEEN D. SHIELDS, ESQUIRE, AND KRISTA REALE SAMIS, ESQUIRE, AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION, WITH ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 56688720 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 30, 2015 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 01-28-2015 11:35 BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION DBA MANSFIELD SCIENTIFIC INC & MICROVASIVE INC ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 56683526 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 13, 2015 COMPLAINT PRAECIPE SUMMONS ANSWERS FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: ELS TRANSACTION ID: 56581960 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PELVIC MESH DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 13, 2015 INIT FILING PELVIC MESH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.