Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Miller, Chase N, against Scott, Tamiko, Scott, Tamiko D, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with WALLACE, PAUL R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryMortgage Mediation |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 25, 2015 CERTIFIED MAIL SERVED 04-29-2014 09:00 TAMIKO SCOTT AKA TAMIKO D SCOTT ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 56818267 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 9, 2015 SHERIFF SALE SERVED 11-12-2014 10:00 TAMIKO SCOTT A K A TAMIKO D. SCOTT ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 56566942 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
November 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 13, 2014 AFFIDAVIT OF CHRISTINA J. PROSS, NOTICE TO TENANTS AND LIENHOLDERS OF FORECLOSURE SALE ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 56321067 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 19, 2014 WRIT ISSUED AND CHECK SENT TO SHERIFF ON 9-19-2014 ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 56054441 WRIT ISSUED |
|
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 11, 2014 WRIT OF LEV FAC EXHIBIT A TO THE WRIT OF LEV FAC, LONG LEGAL EXHIBIT B TO THE WRIT OF LEV FAC, SHORT LEGAL PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 56009748 LEVARI FACIAS |
|
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JULY 16, 2014 CERTIFIED MAIL SERVED 04-29-2014 09:00 TAMIKO SCOTT AKA TAMIKO D SCOTT ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 55731076 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT LOSS MITIGATION DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 1, 2014 AFFIDAVIT OF EXMPTION FROM LOSS MITIGATION ACCEPTED BY: PLR TRANSACTION ID: 55514539 AFFIDAVIT LOSS MITIGATION |
|
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 1, 2014 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: TAMIKO SCOTT a/k/a TAMIO D. SCOTT JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $139,330.81 TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT= $139,330.81 DIRECTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN REM AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DIRECTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN REM, STATEMENT OF AMOUNT DUE ACCEPTED BY: PLR TRANSACTION ID: 55514539 DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FILED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 30, 2014 AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS ACCEPTED BY: PLR TRANSACTION ID: 55514311 AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE MEDIATION CANCELLATION NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: MAY 28, 2014 MEDIATION CANCELLATION NOTICE. DEFENDANT FAILED TO RESPOND TO CANCELLATION REQUEST. PLAINTIFF MAY PROCEED WITH FORECLOSURE. ACCEPTED BY: PLR TRANSACTION ID: 55501904 MEDIATION CANCELLATION NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.