Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dexsta Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Cecil Jr., Robert D, against Nderitu, Hellen W, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryJustice Of The Peace Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 30, 2016 JUDGMENT SATISFIED ON 9-29-16 ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 59629465 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
POWER OF ATTORNEY FROM DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 17, 2016 POWER OF ATTORNEY TO SATISFY JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 59572228 POWER OF ATTORNEY FILED |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 1, 2014 TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT AND EXECUTION FOR TRANSFER TO SUPERIOR COURT ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 54773581 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING JUSTICE OF THE PEACE COURT SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 1, 2014 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: HELLEN W NDERITU JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $7104.54 INIT FILING JP COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.