Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dexsta Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Cecil Jr., Robert D, against Harrison, Sabrina M, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryJustice Of The Peace Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: MAY 28, 2015 NOTICE TO INFORM OF WAGE GARNISHMENT REC'D ON 5-27-15 ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 57294875 NOTICE |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MAY 27, 2015 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 05-19-2015 15:55 THE BOEING COMPANY ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 57289388 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MAY 13, 2015 WRIT ISSUED SENT TO SHERIFF ON 5-14-15 ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 57229252 WRIT ISSUED |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: ATTACHMENT FI FA DATE DOCKETED: MAY 6, 2015 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 57181870 ATTACHMENT FIFA |
|
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 7, 2014 ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR GARNISHMENT OF WAGES 10-6-2014 ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 56151128 NOTICE |
|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 23, 2014 REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 09-19-2014 13:15 THE BOEING COMPANY ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 56067216 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 16, 2014 WRIT ISSUED CHECK SENT TO SHERIFF ON 9-16-14 ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 56033187 WRIT ISSUED |
|
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: ATTACHMENT FI FA DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 11, 2014 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 56011693 ATTACHMENT FIFA |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 1, 2014 TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT AND EXECUTION FOR TRANSFER TO SUPERIOR COURT ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 54772635 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING JUSTICE OF THE PEACE COURT SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 1, 2014 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: SABRINA M HARRISON JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $11462.80 INIT FILING JP COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.