Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dexsta Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Cecil Jr., Robert D, against Strek, Harry J, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryJustice Of The Peace Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 28, 2014 GARNISHMENT DENIAL NOTICE ON 9-26-2014 ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 56095997 LETTER |
|
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 9, 2014 CORPORATION OR BUSINESS WITHOUT A REGISTERED AGENT SERVED 09-03-2014 11:59 E I DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 55992520 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 29, 2014 WRIT ISSUED SENT TO SHERIFF ON 8-29-14 ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 55956615 WRIT ISSUED |
|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: ATTACHMENT FI FA DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 28, 2014 GARNISHMENT WRIT PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 55945262 ATTACHMENT FIFA |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 1, 2014 TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT AND EXECUTION FOR TRANSFER TO SUPERIOR COURT ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 54772380 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING JUSTICE OF THE PEACE COURT SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 1, 2014 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: HARRY J. STREK JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $4454.86 INIT FILING JP COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.