Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Willis, Alice J, White, Willie E, Allen, Larry B, Fletcher, Audrey I, Wells, Jack, (total of 192) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Ahern, Brian D, Frame, Whitney L, Barillo, Nathan, Donelson, Matthew P, Hrubiec, R. Joseph, (total of 9) See All against Trane Us Inc, Defense Coordinating Counsel, Union Carbide Corp, Georgia Pacific Llc, Grinnell Llc, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, ASBESTOS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryAsbestos |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED/GRANTED (MISCELLANEOUS CASES) DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 16, 2019 ORDER SIGNED/GRANTED (MISC) |
|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 8, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE) ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 64072275 ORDER |
|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
OMNIBUS MOTION DATE DOCKETED: JULY 4, 2019 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE, TO BE PRESENTED TO THE COURT AT THE NEXT OMNIBUS MOTION HEARING ON AUGUST 8, 2019. PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 63506352 OMNIBUS MOTION |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
OMNIBUS MOTION DATE DOCKETED: MAY 9, 2019 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE. NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE, TO BE INCLUDED ON THE JUNE 20, 2019 OMNIBUS AGENDA PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE. ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 63244148 OMNIBUS MOTION |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 12, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC.'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS-CLAIMS) ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 63050537 ORDER |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 12, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS-CLAIMS BASED ON A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL) ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 63050547 ORDER |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
OMNIBUS MOTION DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 24, 2019 DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS-CLAIMS BASED ON A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL NOTICE OF DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS-CLAIMS BASED ON A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL, TO BE PRESENTED AT THE OMNIBUS HEARING ON FEBRUARY 21, 2019 PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS-CLAIMS BASED ON A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL EXHIBIT A TO DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS-CLAIMS BASED ON A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: ASA TRANSACTION ID: 62888134 OMNIBUS MOTION |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
OMNIBUS MOTION DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 24, 2019 DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC.'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS-CLAIMS BASED ON A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL NOTICE OF DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC.'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS-CLAIMS, TO BE PRESENTED AT THE OMNIBUS HEARING ON FEBRUARY 21, 2019 PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC.'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS-CLAIMS EXHIBIT A TO DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC.'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS-CLAIMS ACCEPTED BY: ASA TRANSACTION ID: 62888077 OMNIBUS MOTION |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 10, 2018 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ESTABLISH APPLICABLE LAW) ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 62654387 ORDER |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 31, 2018 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ESTABLISH APPLICABLE LAW NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ESTABLISH APPLICABLE LAW, TO BE PRESENTED TO THE COURT ON NOVEMBER 8, 2018 AT 2:30 PM. PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ESTABLISH APPLICABLE LAW ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 62606260 MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.