Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Adair, Frederick M, Adams, Barbara, Allen, Larry B, Alpaugh, Brett, Anderson-Person, Sharon, (total of 193) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Barillo, Nathan, Bocchino, Amaryah K, Browning, Ryan W, Cincilla, Jason A, Coffey, Diane M, (total of 28) See All against Asbestos Corp Ltd, Asbestos Corporation Limited, Borgwarner Morse Tec Llc, Defense Coordinating Counsel, Gardner Denver Inc, (total of 16) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, ASBESTOS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryAsbestos |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED/GRANTED (MISCELLANEOUS CASES) DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 16, 2019 ORDER SIGNED/GRANTED (MISC) |
|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 8, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE) ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 64072275 ORDER |
|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
OMNIBUS MOTION DATE DOCKETED: JULY 4, 2019 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE, TO BE PRESENTED TO THE COURT AT THE NEXT OMNIBUS MOTION HEARING ON AUGUST 8, 2019. PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 63506352 OMNIBUS MOTION |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
OMNIBUS MOTION DATE DOCKETED: MAY 9, 2019 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE. NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE, TO BE INCLUDED ON THE JUNE 20, 2019 OMNIBUS AGENDA PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSE. ACCEPTED BY: AK TRANSACTION ID: 63244148 OMNIBUS MOTION |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 13, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS-CLAIMS BASED UPON PLAINTIFF'S NON-OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT) ACCEPTED BY: ASA TRANSACTION ID: 63057872 ORDER |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 9, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC BASED UPON PLAINTIFFS' DECISION NOT TO OPPOSE SUMMARY JUDGMENT) ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 63047469 ORDER |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
OMNIBUS MOTION DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 5, 2019 DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS-CLAIMS BASED UPON PLAINTIFF'S NON-OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE OF DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS AND CROSS-CLAIMS BASED UPON PLAINTIFF'S NON-OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: ASA TRANSACTION ID: 62926871 OMNIBUS MOTION |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
OMNIBUS MOTION DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 11, 2019 OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC BASED UPON PLAINTIFFS' DECISION NOT TO OPPOSE SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE OF OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC TO BE PRESENTED AT THE OMNIBUS HEARING ON THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 21, 2019 PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC BASED UPON PLAINTIFFS' DECISION NOT TO OPPOSE SUMMARY JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: ASA TRANSACTION ID: 62847042 OMNIBUS MOTION |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 13, 2018 DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE OF DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO BE HEARD FEBRUARY 28, 2019 PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 62746477 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 7, 2018 DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF SUPPORT THEREOF NOTICE OF DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO BE HEARD BY THE COURT ON FEBRUARY 28, 2019 PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: ASA TRANSACTION ID: 62725965 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.