Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Popczyk, Krzsztof, filed a(n) Petition Return Of Property case against State Of Delaware, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2010 |
CategoryPetition Return Of Property |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
STIPULATED ORDER AND DISMISSAL SIGNED BY TOLIVER, J. ON 3/15/11. PETITION IS DISMISSED. DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 18, 2011 COURT DISMISSAL |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
STIPULATED ORDER AND DISMISSAL FILED DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 9, 2011 STIPULATION |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION REMOVED FROM CALENDAR AT THE STATE'S REQUEST DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 3, 2011 MOTION REMOVED FROM CALENDAR |
|
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM R. O'NEILL TO CASE MGR - STATE REQUESTS MOTION BE REMOVED FROM CALENDAR DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 25, 2011 LETTER |
|
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS SCHEDULED FOR 2/28/11 AT 1:30 PM DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 14, 2011 MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF CLAIMANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, FIRST SET OF INTERROGS AND FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DIRECTED TO THE STATE. DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 3, 2011 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
|
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF STATE'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGS AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 3, 2011 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MISCELLANEOUS - PETITION RETURN OF PROPERTY RE: $4,380.00 USC DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 8, 2010 MISC-PET RETURN OF PROPERTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.