Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Beneficial Delaware Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Barnett, Thomas D, Cartwright, Lisa K, Rutigliano, Sarah M, against Parkstone Iii, Dennis E, Parkstone, Sandra J, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with COOCH, RICHARD R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOOCH, RICHARD R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
CategoryMortgage |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 28, 2012 SHERIFF RETURN ON 9-27-2012, SOLD TO PLAINTIFF ( BUY BACK) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 46681683 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 14, 2012 PROOF OF MAILING - RULE 69 (G) NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS EXHIBITS ACCEPTED BY: LM TRANSACTION ID: 45853059 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 20, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: COOCH, RICHARD R WRIT ISSUED 6-20-2012 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 44890976 WRIT ISSUED |
|
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS LEVARI FACIAS PRAECIPE EXHIBIT-LEGAL DESCRIPTION ACCEPTED BY: LM TRANSACTION ID: 44749829 LEVARI FACIAS |
|
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FILED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 23, 2012 AFFIDAVIT OF EXEMPTION FROM LOSS MITIGATION ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 44390058 AFFIDAVIT FILED |
|
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF MAILING AND POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 4(F)(4) FILED DATE DOCKETED: MAY 23, 2012 NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS-PROOF OF MAILING-RULE 4 (F)(4) EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS EXHIBIT C TO NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS EXHIBIT D TO NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 44390058 PROOF OF MAILING RULE 4(F)(4) |
|
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: MAY 23, 2012 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: **ODP_CDIDOCA_ASSOC_PERSONS JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: **DE_GENERAL_JUDG_ASSESSMENTS TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT= **DE_GENERAL_JUDGMENT_AMOUNT DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST SANDRA J. PARKSTONE AND DENNIS E. PARKSTONE, III AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 44390058 DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
May 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 16, 2012 DORMANT DOCKET REMOVAL LETTER ACCEPTED BY: CC TRANSACTION ID: 44187511 LETTER |
|
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
DORMANT DOCKET LETTER DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 28, 2011 LETTER PLACING ON DORMANT DOCKET TO COUNSEL ACCEPTED BY: MKT TRANSACTION ID: 41578292 DORMANT DOCKET LETTER |
|
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 25, 2011 LETTER FROM SARAH M. RUTIGLIANO TO THE COURT REQUESTING MATTER BE PLACED ON DORMANT DOCKET ACCEPTED BY: MKT TRANSACTION ID: 37769653 LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.