Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Chase Home Finance Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Aulgur Jr., Robert T, against Pennell, William W, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with PARKINS JR., JOHN A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKINS JR., JOHN A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
CategoryMortgage |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 29, 2011 DEC 28, 2011- SHERIFF RETURNED LEV FAC- SOLD TO PLTF (BUY BACK) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 41603855 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT OF BID DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 3, 2011 ASSIGNMENT OF BID FROM CHASE HOME FINANCE, LLC TO FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 41186306 ASSIGNMENT OF BID |
|
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 11, 2011 PLAINTIFF'S RULE 69 (G) AFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS OF SALE ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 40245873 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS LEVARI FACIAS PRAECIPE LEGAL DESCRIPTION ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 39023388 LEVARI FACIAS |
|
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 4, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: PARKINS, JOHN LEV FAC ISSUED 8-4-11 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 39070607 WRIT ISSUED |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: JULY 21, 2011 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: WILLIAM W PENNELL JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: TOTAL DEBT $206508.71 TO INCLUDE IN THE JUDGMENT INTEREST TO DATE OF CONFIRMATION, LATE CHARGES TO DATE OF CONFIRMATION, ESCROW ADVANCES TO DATE OF CONFIRMATION, REASONABLE COUNSEL FEES AS PROVIDED IN THE MORTAGE, COSTS, AND ALL OTHER SUMS NOW DUE OR THAT MAY BE BECOME DUE UNDER THE MORTGAGE. TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT= $206508.71 DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST WILLIAM W. PENNELL AFFIDAVIT OF ROBERT T. AULGUR, ESQ. AFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS (PROOF OF MAILING) (RULE 4F4) ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 38786514 DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
ALIAS - CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED NON-EST DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 29, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: PARKINS, JOHN -- ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 38397889 ALIAS-CERT MAIL RETURN NON-EST |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 21, 2011 ALIAS WRIT RETURNED NON EST AS TO WILLIAM W. PENNELL ON 6-8-11. RETURNED 6-14-11. ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 38210857 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 17, 2011 ALIAS SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE ON WILLIAM W. PENNELL ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 36497717 WRIT ISSUED |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 19, 2011 ALIAS PRAECIPE ALIAS SUMMONS ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 36032453 ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.