Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hsbc Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Barnett, Thomas D, Cartwright, Lisa K, against Rappa, Jennifer, Rappa, John P, Rappa, John D, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with TOLIVER IV, CHARLES H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTOLIVER IV, CHARLES H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2010 |
CategoryMortgage |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 24, 2011 ALIAS WRIT RETURNED NON-EST AS TO JOHN D. RAPPA AKA JOHN P. RAPPA ON 03-02-2011. **RECEIVED ATTACHED FAX - 209 BROADHAVEN ROAD HOCKESSIN, DE. 19707 TO CEASE SERVICE - LOAN REINSTATED - REQUESTED BY KELLIE HUNTER FROM ATLANTIC** ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 36643503 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 24, 2011 ALIAS WRIT RETURNED NON-EST AS TO JENNIFER RAPPA ON 03-02-2011. **RECEIVED ATTACHED FAX - 209 BROADHAVEN ROAD HOCKESSIN, DE. 19707 TO CEASE SERVICE - LOAN REINSTATED - REQUESTED BY KELLIE HUNTER FROM ATLANTIC** ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 36643503 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 5, 2011 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 36276458 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
February 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 22, 2011 ALIAS WRIT ISSUED TO THE SHERIFF OF NEW CASTLE COUNTY ON 02-18-2011 FOR SERVICE ON THE DEFENDANTS. ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 36054538 WRIT ISSUED |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 9, 2011 ALIAS PRAECIPE FOR SERVICE ON JOHN D. RAPPA, AKA JOHN P. RAPPA AND JENNIFER RAPPA ALIAS SUMMONS FOR SERVICE ON JOHN D. RAPPA, AKA JOHN P. RAPPA AND JENNIFER RAPPA ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 35785317 ALIAS PRAECIPE FILED |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 27, 2011 WRIT RETURNED NON-EST AS TO JENNIFER RAPPA ON 01-19-2011. ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 35596100 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 27, 2011 WRIT RETURNED NON-EST AS TO JOHN D. RAPPA ON 01-19-2011. ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 35596100 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 21, 2010 2 WRITS ISSUED DECEMBER 20 2010 ACCEPTED BY: LM TRANSACTION ID: 34962396 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 8, 2010 INIT FILING MORTGAGE |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 8, 2010 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION SHEET PRAECIPE SUMMONS SUMMONS 2 EXHIBIT A EXHIBIT B ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 34692090 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.