Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Metlife Home Loans, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Barnett, Thomas D, Cartwright, Lisa K, against Flores, Vicente, Hernandez, Nancy, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JURDEN, JAN R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJURDEN, JAN R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2010 |
CategoryMortgage |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 11, 2012 JAN 10, 2012- SHERIFF RETURNED LEV FAC- SOLD TO PLTF (BUY BACK) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 41799273 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
October 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 11, 2011 AFFIDAVIT-PROOF OF MAILING-RULE 69 (G) NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS EXHIBIT ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 40262092 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS ALIAS LEVARI FACIAS ALIAS PRAECIPE EXHIBIT-LEGAL DESCRIPTION ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 38721451 LEVARI FACIAS |
|
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JULY 30, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: JURDEN, JAN R ALIAS LEV FAC ISSUED 8-1-11 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 38978987 WRIT ISSUED |
|
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JULY 14, 2011 WRIT RETURNED (LEV FAC) ON 07-01-2011 SHERIFF SALE STAYED BY ATTY ON 06-14-2011 ACCEPTED BY: CC1 TRANSACTION ID: 38675111 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
June 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 9, 2011 AFFIDAVIT-PROOF OF MAILING-RULE 69 (G) NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS EXHIBIT ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 38017748 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS LEVARI FACIAS PRAECIPE EXHIBIT-LEGAL DESCRIPTION ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 36727117 LEVARI FACIAS |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 1, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: JURDEN, JAN R LAV FAC ISSUED 3-31-11 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 36788936 WRIT ISSUED |
|
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF MAILING AND POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 4(F)(4) FILED DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 9, 2011 NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS-PROOF OF MAILING-RULE 4 (F)(4) AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS EXHIBIT C TO NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS EXHIBIT D TO NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS ACCEPTED BY: RAM TRANSACTION ID: 36322800 PROOF OF MAILING RULE 4(F)(4) |
|
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
TRANSFER TO JUDGMENTS - FULL DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 9, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: JURDEN, JAN R --- ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 36341600 TRANSFER TO JUDGMENTS: FULL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.