Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Aulgur Jr., Robert T, against Shockley, Monica, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with CARPENTER JR., WILLIAM C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARPENTER JR., WILLIAM C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2010 |
CategoryMortgage |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 31, 2011 LEV FAC WRIT RETURNED ON MONICA SHOCKLEY ON 8-23-11. PROPERTY SOLD AT SHERIFF'S SALE ON 7-12-11 TO PLAINTIFF. RETURNED 8-24-11. ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 39555591 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT OF BID DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 9, 2011 ASSIGNMENT OF BID ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 39122762 ASSIGNMENT OF BID |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS OF SHERIFF'S SALE AND PROOF OF POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 69 (G) FILED DATE DOCKETED: JULY 12, 2011 PLAINTIFF'S RULE 69 (G) AFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO LIEN HOLDERS OF SALE ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 38582684 CIVIL RULE 69 (G) |
|
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MAY 14, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: CARPENTER, WILLIAM C LEV FAC ISSUED 5-13-11 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 37565746 WRIT ISSUED |
|
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS WRIT OF LEVARI FACIAS LEVARI FACIAS PRAECIPE LEGAL DESCRIPTION ACCEPTED BY: SJ TRANSACTION ID: 37473374 LEVARI FACIAS |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF MAILING AND POSTING PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT CIVIL RULE 4(F)(4) FILED DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 29, 2011 AFFIDAVIT OF NOTICE TO LIENHOLDERS (PROOF OF MAILING) (RULE 4F4) AFFIDAVIT OF ROBERT T. AULGUR, ESQ. ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 37294358 PROOF OF MAILING RULE 4(F)(4) |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
TRANSFER TO JUDGMENTS - FULL DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 30, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: CARPENTER, WILLIAM C -- ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 37308531 TRANSFER TO JUDGMENTS: FULL |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 29, 2011 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: MONICA SHOCKLEY JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: TOTAL DEBUT $56040.95 YOU ARE ALSO DIRECTED TO INCLUDE IN THE JUDGMENT INTEREST TO DATE OF CONFIRMATION, LATE CHARGES TO DATE OF CONFIRMATION, ESCROW ADVANCES TO DATE OF CONFIRMATION, COUNSEL FEES AS PROVIDED IN THE MORTGAGE, COSTS, AND ALL OTHER SUMS NOW DUE OR THAT MAY BE BECOME DUE UNDER THE MORTGAGE. TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT= $56040.95 DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST MONICA SHOCKLEY AFFIDAVIT OF ROBERT T. AULGUR, ESQ. ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 37294358 DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 26, 2011 NON EST TO MONICA SHOCKLEY ON 3-15-11. POSTED PROPERTY ON 3-15-11. SENT 1ST CLASS AND CERTIFIED LETTERS ON 3-15-11. ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 36676238 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 28, 2011 1 ALIAS WRIT ISSUED FOR MONICA SHOCKLEY ON 2-25-11. ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 36139653 WRIT ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.