Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hatfield, Lisa R, against Knothe, Charles, Little Estate, Catherine B, Little Estate, Catherine E, Little Estate, J Glenn, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with LEGROW, ABIGAIL M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2010 |
CategoryMortgage |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MAY 22, 2012 SHERIFF RETURN ON 5-21-2012 WRIT OF POSSESSION ON 5-17-2012 , EVICTION EXECUTED ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 44375289 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ON FRED S SILVERMAN DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 31, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: SILVERMAN, FRED S WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED ON 4-2-2012 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 43387244 WRIT OF POSSESSION |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ON LISA ROBERSON HATFIELD DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 21, 2012 WRIT OF POSSESSION LEGAL DESCRIPTION PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 43182659 WRIT OF POSSESSION |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 17, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: SILVERMAN, FRED S CLERK'S JUDICIAL ACTION FORM FROM RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING HELD BEFORE SILVERMAN, J ON 3-16-2012 ACCEPTED BY: LKE TRANSACTION ID: 43127595 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 17, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: SILVERMAN, FRED S MOTION FOR RULE ABSOLUTE CONVENTIONALLY FILED IN COURT BY PLTF'S COUNSEL ON 3-16-2012 ACCEPTED BY: LKE TRANSACTION ID: 43127468 MOTION |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 17, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: SILVERMAN, FRED S ORDER GRANTING RULE ABSOLUTE SO ORDERED BY SILVERMAN, J ON 3-16-12012. MOTION UNOPPOSED. ACCEPTED BY: LKE TRANSACTION ID: 43127468 ORDER |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 29, 2012 WRIT RETURNED--RTSC POSTED PROPERTY KNOWN AS 809 PRINCETON ROAD, WILMINGTON, DE 19807 ON 2-23-2012 ACCEPTED BY: LKE TRANSACTION ID: 42762912 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 14, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: SILVERMAN, FRED S SO ORDERED BY SILVERMAN, J, ORDER SETTING RULE TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ACCEPTED BY: LKE TRANSACTION ID: 42460132 ORDER |
|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ON LISA ROBERSON HATFIELD DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 18, 2012 AFFIDAVIT AND PETITION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION CIS RULE TO SHOW CAUSE OREDER TO SHOW CAUSE PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 41888157 WRIT OF POSSESSION |
|
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 22, 2011 NOV 18, 2011- SHERIFF RETURNED LEV FAC- SOLD TO PLTF (BUY BACK) ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 41003437 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.