Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gooding, Jeff, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Wasserman, Jeffrey P, against Klabe, Kevin S, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2010 |
CategoryJustice Of The Peace Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MAY 22, 2012 SUSSEX COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE GOODS AND CHATTELS SALE EXECUTED ON MAY 16,2012 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 44380312 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 7, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE WRIT ISSUED 2/7/2012 FOR GOODS AND CHATTELS ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 42319275 WRIT ISSUED |
|
January 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 18, 2012 FIERI FACIAS SALE ON REAL AND OR PERSONAL PROPERTY PRAECIPE FI FA SALE ON DEFENDANTS: GOODS AND CHATTELS ACCEPTED BY: DHW TRANSACTION ID: 41914349 VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) |
|
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 18, 2011 FIERI FACIAS SALE ON REAL AND OR PERSONAL PROPERTY PRAECIPE FI FA LEVY & SALE-DEFENDANT'S GOODS AND CHATTELS ACCEPTED BY: CC1 TRANSACTION ID: 39317279 VEND EX (VENDITIONI EXPONAS) |
|
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JULY 15, 2011 TESTATUM - TRANSFERRING JUDGMENT TO KENT COUNTY. ACCEPTED BY: MQC TRANSACTION ID: 38699358 WRIT ISSUED |
|
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR:TESTATUM FIFA ISSUED: DATE DOCKETED: JULY 14, 2011 JUDGMENT - EXECUTION TESTATUM FIFA TO KENT COUNTY JUDGMENT - EXECUTION TESTATUM FIFA TO KENT ACCEPTED BY: MQC TRANSACTION ID: 38665006 TESTATUM FIFA ISSUED |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 3, 2011 TESTATUM - TRANSFERRING JUDGMENT TO SUSSEX COUNTY. ACCEPTED BY: MQC TRANSACTION ID: 37911063 WRIT ISSUED |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR:TESTATUM FIFA ISSUED: DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 3, 2011 JUDGMENT - EXECUTION TESTATUM FIFA - TO SUSSEX COUNTY PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: MQC TRANSACTION ID: 37896291 TESTATUM FIFA ISSUED |
|
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 13, 2011 SHERIFFS RETURN FOR LEVY ON G&C'S ACCEPTED BY: MQC TRANSACTION ID: 36990013 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 3, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE LEVY ON G&C'S ISSUED 2-3-11. SUSSEX COUNTY ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 35710805 WRIT ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.