Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Route 17 Llc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Scanlon, Patrick, against Marsh, David C, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2010 |
CategoryCourt Of Common Pleas Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 16, 2011 SOLD TO THIRD PARTY:MOTOR VEHICLE LEVY & IMP GODCHILDS. RETURNED FILED ON 7-29-11 ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 39274856 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: MAY 20, 2011 MAY 18, 2011- SHERIFF RETURNED FIFA LEVY- SOLD TO THIRD PARTY MAY 13, 2011 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 37694397 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
March 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 11, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE LEVY ON M-V, 2000 CHEVROLET, ISSUED 3-11-11. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 36391217 WRIT ISSUED |
|
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: FIFA ATTACHMENT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 8, 2011 PLAINTIFF ROUTE 17 LLC LEVY AGAINST DEFENDANT DAVID C MARSH. EXECUTION PRAECIPE EXHIBIT - DMV TITLE REPORT ACCEPTED BY: MQC TRANSACTION ID: 36311668 FIFA ATTACHMENT |
|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 11, 2011 FEBRUARY 1, 2011 SHERIFF RETURNED FIFA WAGE ATTACHMENT - SERVED HENKELS AND MCCOY INC 01-25-2011 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 35889056 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 11, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE WAGE ATT. ISSUED 1-11-11. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 35290641 WRIT ISSUED |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: ATTACHMENT FI FA DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 4, 2011 PLAINTIFF ROUTE 17 LLC WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FIFA AGAINST DEFENDANT DAVID C MARSH. EXECUTION PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: MQC TRANSACTION ID: 35142964 ATTACHMENT FIFA |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING COURT OF COMMON PLEAS SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 8, 2010 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: DAVID C MARSH JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $7204.54 INIT FILING COURT COMMON PLEAS |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 8, 2010 JUDGMENT TRANSFER FROM THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS. JUDGMENT ENTERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $7204.54. ACCEPTED BY: CC1 TRANSACTION ID: 34681629 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.