Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Delaware Division Of Revenue, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Drowos, Stuart B, Drowos, Stuart Dor, against Flowers, Betty A, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge*JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2010 |
CategoryDivision Of Revenue Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 15, 2013 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - BETTY A FLOWERS ACCEPTED BY: DHW TRANSACTION ID: 48903682 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
DIVISION OF REVENUE TAX WARRANT FILED DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 24, 2011 TAX WARRANT - BETTY A FLOWERS ACCEPTED BY: SJ TRANSACTION ID: 38281046 TAX WARRANT FILED |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DIVISION OF REVENUE (DOR) SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 8, 2010 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: BETTY A FLOWERS JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $1571.94 INIT FILING DIV OF REVENUE |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 8, 2010 DIVISION OF REVENUE JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: CC1 TRANSACTION ID: 34681336 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.