Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Scanlon, Patrick, against Henry, Joyce L, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCourt Of Common Pleas Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 2, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE WRIT RETURNED 12-1-2011 LEVY SERVICE WAS NULLA BONA ACCEPTED BY: CC1 TRANSACTION ID: 41177808 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: FIFA ATTACHMENT DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 2, 2011 PLAINTIFF, CACH, LLC, WRIT OF FIFA ATTACHMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT, JOYCE L HENRY. EXECUTION PRAECIPE DMV INFO ACCEPTED BY: CC1 TRANSACTION ID: 39606914 FIFA ATTACHMENT |
|
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 12, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE WRIT ISSUED ON MOTOR VEHICLE ON 9-12-11 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 39729395 WRIT ISSUED |
|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 2, 2010 JUDGMENT TRANSFER FROM THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS. JUDGMENT ENTERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $4237.25. ACCEPTED BY: CC1 DATE DOCKETED: 02-OCT-2010 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING COURT OF COMMON PLEAS SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 2, 2010 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: JOYCE L HENRY JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $4237.25 INIT FILING COURT COMMON PLEAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.