Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Scanlon, Patrick, against Szymanski, Christopher M, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCourt Of Common Pleas Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 15, 2013 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 9-13-13 ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 54149122 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 29, 2011 DEC 23, 2011- SHERIFF RETURNED WAGE ATT- SERVICE ON NEW CASTLE COUNTY POLICE DEPARMENT BY PAYROLL 12-15-11 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 41596460 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 8, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE WRIT ISSUED 12-07-2011 WAGE ATTACHMENT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 41269307 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR: ATTACHMENT FI FA DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 3, 2011 PLAINTIFF, CACH, LLC WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FIFA AGAINST DEFENDANT, CHRISTOPHER M SZYMANSKI. EXECUTION PRAECIPE ACCEPTED BY: CC1 TRANSACTION ID: 41185573 ATTACHMENT FIFA |
|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 2, 2010 JUDGMENT TRANSFER FROM THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS. JUDGMENT ENTERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $6131.66. ACCEPTED BY: CC1 DATE DOCKETED: 02-OCT-2010 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING COURT OF COMMON PLEAS SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 2, 2010 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: CHRISTOPHER M SZYMANSKI JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $6131.66 INIT FILING COURT COMMON PLEAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.