Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Delaware Division Of Revenue, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Black, Edward K, Connell, Ryan P, Drowos, Stuart B, Handlon, Joseph C, against Frantone, Forrest, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2010 |
CategoryDivision Of Revenue Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
GARNISHMENT ISSUED TO EMPLOYER (DOR) DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 20, 2018 GARNISHMENT - FORREST FRANTONE ACCEPTED BY: KZ TRANSACTION ID: 62680467 GARNISHMENT ISSUED EMPLOYER |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
DIVISION OF REVENUE TAX WARRANT FILED DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 13, 2018 TAX WARRANT - FORREST FRANTONE ACCEPTED BY: PDD TRANSACTION ID: 61678888 TAX WARRANT FILED |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
DIVISION OF REVENUE TAX WARRANT FILED DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 21, 2015 TAX WARRANT - FORREST FRANTONE ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 58195878 TAX WARRANT FILED |
|
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
DIVISION OF REVENUE TAX WARRANT FILED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 23, 2014 TAX WARRANT - FORREST FRANTONE ACCEPTED BY: DAP TRANSACTION ID: 56229578 TAX WARRANT FILED |
|
April 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
DIVISION OF REVENUE TAX WARRANT FILED DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 7, 2013 TAX WARRANT - FORREST FRANTONE ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 51545302 TAX WARRANT FILED |
|
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
DIVISION OF REVENUE TAX WARRANT FILED DATE DOCKETED: JULY 10, 2012 TAX WARRANT - FORREST FRANTONE ACCEPTED BY: DHW TRANSACTION ID: 45218738 TAX WARRANT FILED |
|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
DIVISION OF REVENUE TAX WARRANT FILED DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 14, 2012 TAX WARRANT - FORREST FRANTONE ACCEPTED BY: DHW TRANSACTION ID: 43044540 TAX WARRANT FILED |
|
October 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
DIVISION OF REVENUE TAX WARRANT FILED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 12, 2011 TAX WARRANT - FORREST FRANTONE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 40265727 TAX WARRANT FILED |
|
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
DIVISION OF REVENUE TAX WARRANT FILED DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 19, 2010 TAX WARRANT - FORREST FRANTONE ACCEPTED BY: CC1 TRANSACTION ID: 34421095 TAX WARRANT FILED |
|
September 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 30, 2010 DIVISION OF REVENUE JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: CC1 DATE DOCKETED: 30-SEP-2010 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.