Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Delaware Division Of Revenue, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Connell, Ryan P, Drowos, Stuart B, Handlon, Joseph C, against Roberts, Francine E, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2010 |
CategoryDivision Of Revenue Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 2, 2013 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - FRANCINE E ROBERTS ACCEPTED BY: KAZ TRANSACTION ID: 54308639 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
DIVISION OF REVENUE TAX WARRANT FILED DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 25, 2011 TAX WARRANT - FRANCINE E ROBERTS ACCEPTED BY: CC1 TRANSACTION ID: 36635340 TAX WARRANT FILED |
|
September 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DIVISION OF REVENUE (DOR) SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 30, 2010 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: FRANCINE E ROBERTS JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $1582.57 INIT FILING DIV OF REVENUE |
|
September 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 30, 2010 DIVISION OF REVENUE JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: CC1 DATE DOCKETED: 30-SEP-2010 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.