Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Town Of Elsmere, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Barillare, Jody C, Mcnally, Edward M, against Lindsay, Colleen, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with *JUDGMENT, JUDGE NEW CASTLE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2010 |
CategoryJudgment (Miscellaneous) |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 5, 2013 JUDGMENT SATISFIED ON 1-4-2013 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 48747737 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT: SATISFIED DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 4, 2013 JUDGMENT: SATISFIED |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 3, 2010 AFFIDAVIT OF JODY C. BARILLARE AND NOTICE OF LIEN AGAINST COLLEEN LINDSAY EXHIBIT A TO AFFIDAVIT OF JODY C. BARILLARE AND NOTICE OF LIEN AGAINST COLLEEN LINDSAY ACCEPTED BY: CC1 DATE DOCKETED: 03-AUG-2010 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING JUDGMENT MISCELLANEOUS SEE IMAGE ATTACHMENT FOR JUDGMENT DETAILS DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 3, 2010 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: COLLEEN LINDSAY JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT AMOUNT $100.00 INIT FILING JUDGMENT MISC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.