Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Brown, Ronald, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Baumberger, David L, Niedzielski, Marc P, Ramunno, L. Vincent, against Floor, Andrew, Gardner, Earl F, State Of Delaware, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JOHNSTON, MARY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHNSTON, MARY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 12, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: JOHNSTON, MARY M SO ORDERED - COURT DISMISSAL (LETTER - CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL) ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 44716326 COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 11, 2012 LETTER - CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 43584741 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
MEDIATOR'S REPORT FILED DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 2, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: JOHNSTON, MARY M MEDIATORS REPORT - AS A RESULT OF MEDIATION, THIS CASE IS : SETTLED ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 42818064 MEDIATOR'S REPORT FILED |
|
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 18, 2012 LETTER TO THE COURT WITHDRAWING STATE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 20, 2012 AT 10:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 42578227 LETTER |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 17, 2012 STATE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE OF MOTION OF STATE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO BE PRESENTED ON FRIDAY, APRIL 20, 2012 AT 10:00 A.M. BEFORE THE COURT EXHIBIT TO STATE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING STATE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION, STATE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 42528769 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 25, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: JOHNSTON, MARY M LETTER DATED JANUARY 9, 2012 FROM THERESA J. MCBREARTY FOR COMMISSIONER MARK S. VAVALA TO COUNSEL: THIS LETTER IS TO CONFIRM THAT MEDIATION IN THE ABOVE MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED BEFORE COMMISSIONER MARK S. VAVALA FOR THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 16, 2012 @ 9:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 42098205 LETTER |
|
August 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2011 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF RONALD BROWN SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 14, 2011 IN THE OFFICE OF L. VINCENT RAMUNNO, ESQ. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF RONALD BROWN ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 39576676 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 31, 2011 RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT GARDNER SET FOR OCTOBER 14, 2011 AT 10 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 39552895 RE-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
August 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 27, 2011 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF EARL GARDNER SET FOR NOVEMBER 2, 2011 AT 1 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 39500374 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 5, 2011 DEFENDANT GARDNER'S NOTICE OF SERVICE FOR RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 39083333 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.