Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pope Investments Ii Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Siegel, Martin J, against Aamaxan Transport Group Inc, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with SCOTT JR, CALVIN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCOTT JR, CALVIN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
CategoryDebt / Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT BY ORDER SO ORDERED BY SCOTT, J. ON 8-29-11 DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 31, 2011 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: AAMAXAN TRANSPORT GROUP INC JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: AMOUNT $10192761.00 JUDGMENT BY ORDER |
|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 31, 2011 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF, POPE INVESTMENTS II, LLC. AND AGAINST DEFENDANT, AAMAXAN TRANSPORT GROUP, INC. IN THE AMOUNT OF $10,192,761.00 SO ORDERED BY SCOTT, J. 8-29-11 ACCEPTED BY: LR TRANSACTION ID: 39555275 JUDGMENT BY ORDER |
|
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 26, 2011 LETTER TO THE HONORABLE CALVIN L. SCOTT, JR. ENCLOSING AFFIDAVIT OF DAMAGES AND ORDER PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF DAMAGES PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED ORDER FOR JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: LR TRANSACTION ID: 39479604 LETTER |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
TRANSFER TO JUDGMENTS - FULL DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 24, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: SCOTT, CALVIN L -- ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 39438251 TRANSFER TO JUDGMENTS: FULL |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 24, 2011 DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST AAMAXAN TRANSPORT GROUP, INC. SO ORDERED BY SCOTT, J. ON 8-23-11 ACCEPTED BY: LR TRANSACTION ID: 39437842 ORDER |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 24, 2011 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT HEARD BEFORE SCOTT, J. ON 8-23-11. *GRANTED* CLERK - L. ROSS; COURT REPORTER - D. VERECHIA. ACCEPTED BY: LR TRANSACTION ID: 39435839 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
July 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 28, 2011 PLAINTIFF'S RE-NOTICE OF MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT SCHEDULED TO BE HEARD BY THE HONORABLE CALVIN L. SCOTT, JR. ON TUESDAY, AUGUST 23, 2011 AT 9:00 A.M. PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR RE-NOTICE OF MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: LR TRANSACTION ID: 38900019 RE-NOTICE |
|
July 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: JULY 24, 2011 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT SCHEDULED TO BE HEARD ON AUGUST 9, 2011 AT 9:00 A.M. PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS A, B AND C FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: LR TRANSACTION ID: 38841495 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MAY 5, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: SCOTT, CALVIN L SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR SERVICE) ACCEPTED BY: LR TRANSACTION ID: 37398078 ORDER |
|
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 27, 2011 (1) ALIAS RETURNED - SERVED AAMAXAN TRANSPORT GROUP, INC. ON 4-11-11 BY SERVING JEFFREY W. BULLOCK, SECRETARY OF THE STATE OF DELAWARE. PROTHONOTARY FILED ON 4-26-11. ACCEPTED BY: LR TRANSACTION ID: 37249893 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.