Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jones, Yvonne, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Culley Esq, David G, Nitsche, Gary S, against Wal-Mart Stores East Lp, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BRADY, M. JANE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRADY, M. JANE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 1, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: BRADY, M JANE SO ORDERED - COURT DISMISSAL, ENTERED THE 30TH DAY OF NOVEMBER, 2011 BY BRADY, J. - LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER TO COUNSEL CONFIRMING SETTLEMENT OF MATTER AND REQUESTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL BE FILED PROMPTLY ACCEPTED BY: KAH TRANSACTION ID: 41143956 COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 9, 2011 LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER TO COUNSEL CONFIRMING SETTLEMENT OF MATTER AND REQUESTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL BE FILED PROMPTLY. ACCEPTED BY: KAH TRANSACTION ID: 39716730 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED, REMOVED FROM CALENDAR COURT NOTIFIED BY ARBITRATOR OF SETTLEMENT OF CASE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 8, 2011 EVENT SCHEDULED AND REMOVED |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL OFFICE CONFERENCE SCHEDULED, REMOVED FROM CALENDAR DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 8, 2011 EVENT SCHEDULED AND REMOVED |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 9, 2011 LETTER TO THE HONORABLE M. JANE BRADY ADVISING THE COURT THIS MATTER HAS BEEN RESOLVED AND RESPECTFULLY REQUESTS THAT THIS MATTER BE REMOVED FROM THE COURT'S TRIAL CALENDAR ON JUNE 18, 2012. ACCEPTED BY: KAH TRANSACTION ID: 39713567 LETTER |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED, REMOVED FROM CALENDAR DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 8, 2011 EVENT SCHEDULED AND REMOVED |
|
September 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 9, 2011 LETTER TO JUDGE BRADY FROM DAVID CULLEY ADVISING THAT ALL CLAIMS PENDING IN THIS ACTION HAVE SETTLED ACCEPTED BY: KAH TRANSACTION ID: 39686801 LETTER |
|
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 11, 2011 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONS NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONS (WAL-MART EMPLOYEES, SCHED. 9.12.11, BEGIN AT 11 AM) ACCEPTED BY: KAH TRANSACTION ID: 39196056 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 11, 2011 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITION NOTICE OF DEPOSITION (ELAINE LABOY, SCHED. 9.12.11, 2PM) ACCEPTED BY: KAH TRANSACTION ID: 39197078 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 9, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: BRADY, M JANE SO ORDERED THIS 5TH DAY OF AUGUST, 2011 BY BRADY, J. - STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER ACCEPTED BY: KAH TRANSACTION ID: 39120660 ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.