Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Howell, Anjae L, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Rhodunda Jr., William J, Pedicone, Michael A, Nitsche, Gary S, against Delaware Foods Llc, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with John A. Parkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn A. Parkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE PARKINS ON 11-13-12. DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 20, 2012 SO ORDERED CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER. ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 47835927 ORDER |
|
October 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 5, 2012 CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER. ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 46812000 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
October 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 4, 2012 LETTER TO THE HONORABLE JOHN A. PARKINS ADVISING THAT THIS MATTER HAS BEEN RESOLVED AND THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ON OCTOBER 3, 2012 AND THE TRIAL ON OCTOBER 22, 2012 MAYBE REMOVED FROM THE COURT'S CALENDAR. ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 46765729 LETTER |
|
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 22, 2012 NOTICE OF VIDEO TRIAL DEPOSITION OF DR PETER BANDERA NOTICE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF VIDEO TRIAL DEPOSITION ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 46012887 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
July 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: JULY 28, 2012 NOTICE OF SERVICE WITHDRAWING MICHAEL PEDICONE AND SUBSTITUTING RHODUNDA & WILLIAMS, LLC AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT DELAWARE FOODS, LLC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 45578500 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
July 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 24, 2012 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR, SETTING HEARING FOR AUGUST 2, 2012 AT 4 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 45463560 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE PARKINS ON 2-29-12. DEFT. SHALL FILE RESPONSES TO PLTF'S. OUTSTANDING INTERROGATORIES ON OR BEFORE MARCH 12, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLTF'S. ATTORNEY IS ENTITLED TO ATTORNEY'S FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $300.00 FOR THE PREPARATION OF THIS MOTION. DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 2, 2012 SO ORDERED PLTF'S. MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES. ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 42804015 ORDER |
|
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 2, 2012 DEFENDANT DELAWARE FOODS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 42801969 NOTICE SRV ANS INTERROGATORIES |
|
February 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL SCHEDULED FOR: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 16, 2012 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES EXHIBITS FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES NOTICE OF HEARING FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES (SCHED. 3.2.12, 9AM, J. PARKINS) PROPOSED ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES NOTICE OF SERVICE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 42477859 MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
September 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER MOTIONS TO ADD OR AMEND 10/26/11 PLTF'S. EXPERT REPORTS 02/23/12 DEFT'S. EXPERT REPORTS 03/23/12 DISCOVERY CUT-OFF 04/23/12 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DEADLINE 05/23/12 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 10/03/12, 11:00 A.M. MOTIONS IN LIMINE 08/27/12 RESPONSES TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE 09/11/12 TRIAL (JURY) 10/22/12, 10:00 A.M. ADR CONDUCTED BY 03/02/12 ADR NOTIFICATION BY 02/02/12 DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 29, 2011 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER ISSUED BY JUDGE PARKINS ON 09-26-2011. ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 40062385 SCHEDULING ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.