Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Price, Taryn, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rock, Patrick G, Friedman, Jeffrey S, against Saylor, Cedric, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with ABLEMAN, PEGGY L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeABLEMAN, PEGGY L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 28, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: ABLEMAN, PEGGY L SO ORDERED (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) ACCEPTED BY: MMM TRANSACTION ID: 47969922 ORDER |
|
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 15, 2012 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: MMM TRANSACTION ID: 47718956 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
________________ SCHEDULED, REMOVED FROM CALENDAR DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 29, 2012 EVENT SCHEDULED AND REMOVED |
|
September 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 26, 2012 30 DAY SETTLE LETTER DATED 09-25-12 ACCEPTED BY: MMM TRANSACTION ID: 46624138 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
OPINION DATE DOCKETED: JULY 31, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: ABLEMAN, PEGGY L OPINION BY ABLEMAN, J., SUBMITTED: 7/25/2012, DECIDED: 7/30/2012 FROM DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - DENIED. ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 45603395 OPINION |
|
July 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED DATE DOCKETED: JULY 28, 2012 PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTED BY: MMM TRANSACTION ID: 45585613 PROPOSED ORDER |
|
July 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: JULY 28, 2012 PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO MSJ NOTICE OF RESPONSE EXHBIT A - DEPOSITION OF DEFEDNAT CEDRIC SAYLOR ACCEPTED BY: MMM TRANSACTION ID: 45583210 RSP MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: JULY 27, 2012 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS A-D IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, TO BE PRESENTED TO THE COURT ON A DATE AND TIME CONVENIENT TO THE COURT DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED ORDER FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND NOTICE OF MOTION ACCEPTED BY: MMM TRANSACTION ID: 45548587 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 27, 2012 LETTER TO THE COURT REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ACCEPTED BY: MMM TRANSACTION ID: 45548587 LETTER |
|
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 20, 2012 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR, SETTING HEARING FOR SEPTEMBER 5, 2012 AT 4 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: MMM TRANSACTION ID: 45440512 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.