Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lajoie, Donna, Hart, Anne, Aubee, George A, Garretson, Alvis, Pettit, Sarah, (total of 53) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Frame, Whitney L, Barillo, Nathan, Larson Jr., William B, Smith, Bryan P, Silverman, Andrew R, (total of 52) See All against Foster Wheeler Corp Inc, Dana Co Llc, Peerless Industries Inc, Defense Coordinating Counsel, Trane Us Inc, (total of 43) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JUDGE, ASBESTOS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDGE, ASBESTOS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
CategoryAsbestos |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 18, 2014 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS ORDER SIGNED - CASE CLOSED (41E ASBESTOS PROPOSED ORDER) ACCEPTED BY: STS TRANSACTION ID: 56345073 COURT DISMISSAL |
|
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 16, 2014 41E ASBESTOS LETTER TO COUNSEL FROM SHARON AGNEW DATED SEPTEMBER 15, 2014. 41E ASBESTOS PROPOSED ORDER ACCEPTED BY: STS TRANSACTION ID: 56032996 LETTER |
|
November 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 2, 2013 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY) ACCEPTED BY: AJD TRANSACTION ID: 54481879 ORDER |
|
September 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
OMNIBUS MOTION DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 13, 2013 OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY ACCEPTED BY: CC TRANSACTION ID: 54117280 OMNIBUS MOTION |
|
September 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 13, 2013 NOTICE OF OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY TO BE HEARD SEPTEMBER 26, 2013 ACCEPTED BY: CC TRANSACTION ID: 54117280 NOTICE |
|
September 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
EXHIBITS DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 13, 2013 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: CC TRANSACTION ID: 54117280 EXHIBITS |
|
September 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 13, 2013 PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY ACCEPTED BY: CC TRANSACTION ID: 54117280 PROPOSED ORDER |
|
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 22, 2013 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL OF BETH E. VALOCCHI, ESQUIRE FOR MEGAN T. MANTZAVINOS, ESQUIRE, JEFFREY S. MARLIN, ESQUIRE AND BRIAN L. KASPRZAK, ESQUIRE FOR FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP. ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 53805556 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 9, 2013 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL OF DAVID W. DEBRUIN, ESQ., FOR PLAINTIFFS AND WITHDRAWAL OF IAN CONNOR BIFFERATO, ESQ. ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 53360313 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL |
|
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 9, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: JUDGE, ASBESTOS SO ORDERED (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS AND CROSSCLAIMS BASED UPON A JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) ACCEPTED BY: AJD TRANSACTION ID: 47628948 ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.