Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Murrey, Maryann, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Kaplan, Gary H, Janczyk, Peter K, against Nemours Foundation, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with JOHNSTON, MARY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHNSTON, MARY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 13, 2013 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 51755289 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 19, 2013 MODIFIED ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHNSTON ON JANUARY 15, 2013 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 49020929 ORDER |
|
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 16, 2013 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR, SETTING HEARING FOR FEBRUARY 12, 2013 AT 8:30 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 48936950 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 12, 2013 AMENDED STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 48886738 STIPULATION |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 11, 2013 STIPULATION & ORDER TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER LETTER TO COURT REGARDING THE STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND DEADLINES. ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 48860458 STIPULATION |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 27, 2012 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER OF DEFENDANT TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER OF DEFENDANT TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES ACCEPTED BY: KDC TRANSACTION ID: 48589256 ANSWER FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES |
|
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 23, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: JOHNSTON, MARY M CASE SCHEDULING ORDER ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 44397495 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MAY 17, 2012 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES AND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 44292016 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 19, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: JOHNSTON, MARY M LETTER SETTING SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE ACCEPTED BY: NT TRANSACTION ID: 43712382 LETTER |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
LAST RESPONSIVE PLEADING DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 29, 2012 LAST RESPONSIVE PLEADING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.