Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Collins, Kelli, Collins, Aubrey, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Duggan, Michael F, Kasprzak, Brian L, Silverman, Michael I, against Samuel, Joseph Thongs, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with ABLEMAN, PEGGY L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeABLEMAN, PEGGY L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JULY 26, 2011 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: MMM TRANSACTION ID: 38859724 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 18, 2011 30 DAY SETTLE LETTER DATED 06-17-11 ACCEPTED BY: MMM TRANSACTION ID: 38211197 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MAY 12, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: ABLEMAN, PEGGY L TRIAL AVAILABILITY LETTER. PLEASE FAX COMPLETED FORM TO JUSTINE (255-2274) WITHIN 14 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS LETTER. ACCEPTED BY: MMM TRANSACTION ID: 37518355 LETTER |
|
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
LAST RESPONSIVE PLEADING DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 27, 2011 LAST RESPONSIVE PLEADING |
|
April 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 26, 2011 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: MMM TRANSACTION ID: 37192945 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 22, 2011 LETTER TO COURT ADVISING OF CASE STATUS ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 37161534 LETTER |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 26, 2011 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ANSWER OF DEFENDANT JOSEPH THONGS SAMUEL TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS ACCEPTED BY: MMM TRANSACTION ID: 37179082 ANSWER & COUNTERCLAIM |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 22, 2011 ENTER THE APPEARANCE OF BRIAN L. KASPRZAK, ESQUIRE AND MICHAEL F. DUGGAN, ESQUIRE AS ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANT JOSEPH THONGS SAMUEL CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO THE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 37163791 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO ABLEMAN, J. FROM MICHAEL SILVERMAN, ESQ. RE: WE BELIEVE SERVICE ACCOMPLISHED & PROVIDED A COURTSEY EXTENSION UNTIL 04/18/11. DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 2, 2011 STATUS LETTER TO THE COURT ACCEPTED BY: MMM TRANSACTION ID: 36810303 LETTER |
|
March 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 1, 2011 STALL LETTER DATED 03-31-11..RE: PLTF.'S COUNSEL MUST REPORT BACK TO THE COURT ON THE STATUS OF THE CASE WITHIN 15 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS LETTER. ACCEPTED BY: MMM TRANSACTION ID: 36778518 LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.