Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Maliwanag, Lilia, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Bhaya, Shakuntla L, Fruehauf, Sarah A, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with CARPENTER JR., WILLIAM C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2010 |
CategoryDebt / Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 30, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: CARPENTER, WILLIAM C SO ORDERED (STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL, JUDGE'S SIGNATURE REQUIRED) ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 36711713 ORDER |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 24, 2011 LETTER TO JUDGE CARPENTER FROM SARAH ROBERTS, REGARDING STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 36632141 LETTER |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
PARTIAL STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 24, 2011 STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL, JUDGE'S SIGNATURE REQUIRED ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 36631366 PARTIAL DISMISSAL |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
TRANSFER TO JUDGMENTS - PARTIAL DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 19, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: CARPENTER, WILLIAM C -- ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 36562828 TRANSFER TO JUDGMENTS: PARTIAL |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
DIRECTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 17, 2011 JUDGMENT IS ENTERED AGAINST: AMBER MCCLURE JUDGMENT AMOUNTS TO BE PAID AS FOLLOWS: TOTAL $14430.52 TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT= $14430.52 DEFENDANT THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S DIRECTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, AMBER N. MCCLURE PURSUANT TO RULE 55 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFENDANT THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO.'S DIRECTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT AMBER N. MCCLURE CERRTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO.'S DIRECTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT AMBER N. MCCLURE ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 36508945 DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 16, 2011 DEFENDANT-THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED RESPONSES TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT-THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED RESPONSES TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFENDANT-THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED RESPONSES TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 36470402 FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 18, 2011 SERVED AMBER MCCLURE PERSONALLY ON 2-14-11. ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 36005439 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 9, 2011 1 THIRD-PARTY WRIT ISSUED ON 2-4-11. ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 35817261 WRIT ISSUED |
|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 21, 2010 ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 34929962 ANSWER |
|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 21, 2010 DEFENDANT THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES ACCEPTED BY: CCM TRANSACTION ID: 34930230 ANSWER FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.