Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Limestone Land Holdings, Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Earle, Scott T, Monzo, Eric J, Harker, James F, against Aces Full Entertainment Inc, Buglio, Brandon, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with SILVERMAN, FRED S presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2010 |
CategoryDebt / Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 19, 2014 SO ORDERED BY SILVERMAN, J. ON JUNE 18, 2014 COURT DISMISSAL. ACCEPTED BY: LCF TRANSACTION ID: 55612602 COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL |
|
June 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
BANKRUPTCY LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 5, 2012 BANKRUPTCY LETTER TO COUNSEL ACCEPTED BY: LKE TRANSACTION ID: 44590636 BANKRUPTCY LETTER |
|
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
PTC AND TRIAL SCHEDULED AND REMOVED FROM CALENDAR, NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILED EVENT SCHEDULED AND REMOVED |
|
May 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 1, 2012 DEFENDANTS SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY EXHIBIT A TO DEFENDANTS SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO DEFENDANTS SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY ACCEPTED BY: LKE TRANSACTION ID: 44516154 NOTICE |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 26, 2012 DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF VACATION OF DEPOSITION ACCEPTED BY: LKE TRANSACTION ID: 43866640 NOTICE |
|
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTIONS NOTICED FOR 4/13/2012, WITHDRAWN BY COUNSEL EVENT SCHEDULED AND REMOVED |
|
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 19, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: SILVERMAN, FRED S SO ORDERED BY SILVERMAN, J STIPULATION TO CASE SCHEDULING ORDER ACCEPTED BY: LKE TRANSACTION ID: 43742641 ORDER |
|
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 19, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: SILVERMAN, FRED S LETTER TO COUNSEL RE: CONFIRMING TIME CHANGE FOR JUNE 7, 2012 MOTION ACCEPTED BY: LKE TRANSACTION ID: 43739721 LETTER |
|
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 18, 2012 LETTER TO THE HONORABLE FRED S. SILVERMAN FROM ERIC MONZO, ESQ. ENCLOSING COPY OF STIPULATION AND PROPOSED AMENDED CASE SCHEDULING ORDER. ACCEPTED BY: LKE TRANSACTION ID: 43713522 LETTER |
|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 17, 2012 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF LIMESTONE LAND HOLDINGS, LLC NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF LIMESTONE LAND HOLDINGS, LLC EXHIBIT A (TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF LIMESTONE LAND HOLDINGS, LLC) EXHIBIT B (TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF LIMESTONE LAND HOLDINGS, LLC) EXHIBIT C (TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF LIMESTONE LAND HOLDINGS, LLC) EXHIBIT D (TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF LIMESTONE LAND HOLDINGS, LLC) EXHIBIT E (TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF LIMESTONE LAND HOLDINGS, LLC) UNREPORTED CASES (FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF LIMESTONE LAND HOLDINGS, LLC) PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF LIMESTONE LAND HOLDINGS, LLC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF LIMESTONE LAND HOLDINGS, LLC ACCEPTED BY: LKE TRANSACTION ID: 43698981 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.