Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Broody, James, Broody, Paula, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fallon, Sherry R, Healy, Kevin G, against Miller, Katherine, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with TOLIVER IV, CHARLES H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JULY 30, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: TOLIVER, CHARLES H SO ORDERED BY JUDGE TOLIVER ON JULY 28, 2011. (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 38992416 ORDER |
|
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: JULY 20, 2011 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 38753288 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 21, 2011 LETTER TO JUDGE TOLIVER FROM SHERRY FALLON, REGARDING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 38768278 LETTER |
|
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 29, 2011 CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER SENT TO COUNSEL ON 06-28-2011: PLEASE FILE A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OR A LETTER STATING THE STATUS OF THIS MATTER WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS LETTER OR THE COURT WILL DISMISS THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 38386382 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 24, 2011 LETTER TO JUDGE TOLIVER FROM SHERRY FALLON. RE: CASE HAS SETTLED. ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 38287311 LETTER |
|
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 8, 2011 ORDER SIGNED BY: TOLIVER, CHARLES H LETTER FROM LORI DOTO TO COUNSEL CONFIRMING SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE WITH JUDGE TOLIVER ON JUNE 21, 2011 AT 9:30 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 37976987 LETTER |
|
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 22, 2011 NOTICE OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 36568965 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 25, 2011 LETTER TO THE COURT FROM PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL REQUESTING TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 36113644 LETTER |
|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 14, 2011 NOTICE OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFFS ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 35881048 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 4, 2011 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 35710780 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.