Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Vincente, Saul, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Clark, Sandra F, Ramunno, L. Vincent, against Tm Cooper Electric L.L.C., Hall, Steven Howard, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with Charles H. Toliver presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 28, 2012 ORDER SIGNED BY: TOLIVER, CHARLES H SO ORDERED BY JUDGE TOLIVER ON 09-25-2012. (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE.) ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 46684598 ORDER |
|
September 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 18, 2012 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 46465501 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED, REMOVED FROM CALENDAR DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 11, 2012 EVENT SCHEDULED AND REMOVED |
|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED, REMOVED FROM CALENDAR DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 11, 2012 EVENT SCHEDULED AND REMOVED |
|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 12, 2012 CONFIRMATION OF DISMISSAL LETTER SENT TO COUNSEL ON 09-11-2012: PLEASE FILE A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OR A LETTER STATING THE STATUS OF THIS MATTER WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS LETTER OR THE COURT WILL DISMISS THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 46365973 CONFIRMATION DISMISSAL LETTER |
|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
ADR - SCHEDULE LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 15, 2012 INITIAL AND SCHEDULING LETTER FROM MEDIATOR, SETTING HEARING FOR AUGUST 15, 2012 AT 2 P.M. ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 44788326 ADR CODES (CONVERSION ONLY) |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MAY 9, 2012 DEFENDANT STEVEN HOWARD HALL'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 44091147 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MAY 1, 2012 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT HALL ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 43976167 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
April 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 6, 2012 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CORPORAL MARC DIFRANCESCO ON APRIL 24, 2012 AT 10:00 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 43501370 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION |
|
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 30, 2012 NOTICE OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES ACCEPTED BY: NMW TRANSACTION ID: 43371881 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.