Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tanner, Daniel, Tanner, Jaime, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Mason Ii, Dennis A, Cline, David P, against Super Fresh Food Markets Inc, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with HERLIHY, JEROME O presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 17, 2013 DORMANT DOCKET LETTER SO ORDERED BY HERLIHY, J. ON 4-15-13 -- CASE CLOSED. ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 51801171 COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL |
|
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
BANKRUPTCY LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 11, 2011 LETTER DATED 1-10-2011 SENT TO COUNSEL: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN PLACED ON THE DORMANT DOCKET ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 35287683 BANKRUPTCY LETTER |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 21, 2010 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT SUPER FRESH FOOD MARKETS, INC. EXHIBIT A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT SUPER FRESH FOOD MARKETS, INC. ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 34873675 NOTICE |
|
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 24, 2010 PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 34480576 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
|
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
LAST RESPONSIVE PLEADING DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 22, 2010 LAST RESPONSIVE PLEADING |
|
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 24, 2010 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANTS ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 34480576 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
|
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 23, 2010 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFFS. ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 34431882 NOTICE OF SERVICE |
|
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 23, 2010 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT, DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES. CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT FOR DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES. ACCEPTED BY: LJO TRANSACTION ID: 34431882 ANSWER |
|
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 8, 2010 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer dated August 11 2010 ACCEPTED BY: LJO DATE DOCKETED: 08-OCT-2010 STIPULATION |
|
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 8, 2010 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer dated October 5 2010 ACCEPTED BY: LJO DATE DOCKETED: 08-OCT-2010 STIPULATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.