Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Doe, Genevieve, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Balaguer, John D, Walsh, Douglas T, Connors, Kevin J, Austin, Jeffrey M, Boyer, Matthew F, (total of 11) See All against Marvel Jr, James P, Lowell F. Scott, M.D., P.A., Tavani, M.D., Carol A., Baybees Pediatrics, P.A., Bradley, M.D., Earl B., (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MAY 9, 2013 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E DISMISSAL CODE ADDED DURING CASE CLEAN UP. CASE ORIGINALLY CLOSED BY ORDER ON APRIL 5, 2011 BY SLIGHTS, J. ORDER PERMITTED FILING OF CLASS ACTION CERTIFICATION. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 52188834 COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL ACTION FORM DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 5, 2010 ORDER SIGNED BY: SLIGHTS, JOSEPH R CLERK'S PROCEEDING SHEET FROM THE OFFICE CONFERENCE ON 11-29-10 BEFORE JRS. ACCEPTED BY: NDR TRANSACTION ID: 34670835 JUDICIAL ACTION FORM |
|
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM FILED DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 18, 2010 MEMO ASSIGNING ATTACHED LIST OF CIVIL CASES INVOLVING EARL B. BRADLEY TO JUDGE SLIGHTS UNTIL FINAL DISPOSITION. ACCEPTED BY: NDR TRANSACTION ID: 34388793 MEMORANDUM FILED |
|
July 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 30, 2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF JOHN D. BALAGUER, ESQUIRE OF WHITE AND WILLIAMS LLP AS CO-COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF MEDICAL SOCIETY OF DELAWARE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF JOHN D. BALAGUER, ESQUIRE, OF WHITE AND WILLIAMS LLP AS CO-COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF MEDICAL SOCIETY OF DELAWARE ACCEPTED BY: LR DATE DOCKETED: 30-JUL-2010 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION DATE DOCKETED: JULY 21, 2010 VERIFICATION OF CAROL A. TAVANI, M.D. TO THE MEDICAL SOCIETY FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - VERIFICATION OF CAROL A. TAVANI, M.D. TO THE MEDICAL SOCIETY FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES ACCEPTED BY: LR DATE DOCKETED: 21-JUL-2010 VERIFICATION |
|
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION DATE DOCKETED: JULY 16, 2010 VERIFICATION OF JAMES P. MARVEL, M.D. TO THE MEDICAL SOCIETY DEFENDANTS' ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - VERIFICATION OF JAMES P. MARVEL, M.D. TO THE MEDICAL SOCIETY DEFENDANTS' ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES ACCEPTED BY: LR DATE DOCKETED: 16-JUL-2010 VERIFICATION |
|
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION DATE DOCKETED: JULY 13, 2010 Verification of Mark A. Meister, Sr., to the Medical Society Defendants' Answers to Form 30 Interrogatories Certificate of Service to the Verification of Mark A. Meister, Sr., to the Medical Society Defendants' Answers to Form 30 Interrogatories ACCEPTED BY: LR DATE DOCKETED: 13-JUL-2010 VERIFICATION |
|
July 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JULY 10, 2010 FILED BY: AGNEW, SHARON SA ORDER - DISCOVERY STAY IS LIFTED - PENDING PROPOSED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT THAT THE COURT MUST SIGN - SO ORDERED BY SCOTT, J. ON 7-7-10. ACCEPTED BY: LR DATE DOCKETED: 10-JUL-2010 ORDER |
|
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 24, 2010 FILED BY: AGNEW, SHARON SA LETTER FROM DEFENDANT BRADLEY TO JUDGE SCOTT DATED JUNE 20, 2010. I DO NOT HAVE AN ATTORNEY FOR THE CIVIL CASES AGAINST ME. I WOULD LIKE TO PLEA NOT GUILTY OF ALL CHARGES, IN ALL THE CASES. RECEIVED IN NCC PROTHONOTARY ON JUNE 23, 2010. ACCEPTED BY: STS DATE DOCKETED: 24-JUN-2010 LETTER |
|
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND CROSSCLAIM DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 24, 2010 DEFENDANTS LOWELL F. SCOTT, JR., M.D. and LOWELL F. SCOTT, M.D., P.A. ANSWER TO COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO STRIKE AND CROSS-CLAIM CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT - DEFENDANTS LOWELL F. SCOTT, JR., M.D. and LOWELL F. SCOTT, M.D., P.A. ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF JEFFREY M. AUSTIN, ESQUIRE AND COLLEEN D. SHIELDS, ESQUIRE OF ELZUFON AUSTIN REARDON TARLOV AND MONDELL, P.A. AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS LOWELL F. SCOTT, JR., M.D. and LOWELL F. SCOTT, M.D., P.A. ANSWER TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES BY DEFENDANTS LOWELL F. SCOTT, JR., M.D. and LOWELL F. SCOTT, M.D., P.A. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - CIS, ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, ANSWER TO COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND CROSS-CLAIM AND ANSWER TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES BY DEFENDANTS LOWELL F. SCOTT, JR., M.D. and LOWELL F. SCOTT, M.D., P.A. ACCEPTED BY: LR DATE DOCKETED: 24-JUN-2010 ANSWER & CROSSCLAIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.