Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bennett, Charlotte filed a(n) Court Of Common Pleas case represented by Gouge Jr, Donald L, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with SILVERMAN, FRED S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSILVERMAN, FRED S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2010 |
CategoryCourt Of Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE SILVERMAN ON 09/12/2011 THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THIS 12TH DAY OF SEPTEMBER, 2011 THAT THIS CASE BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE A COURT OF COMMON PLEAS TRANSCRIPT. APPELLANT'S WERE HEARD BY THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS. THEY WERE DISSATISFIED AND THEY CHOSE TO FILE AND APPEAL. THEY WANTED THE COURT, I.E. THE TAXPAYERS TO PAY FOR THE NECESSARY TRANSCRIPT. APPELLANTS DO NOT HAVE A RIGHT TO PURSUE THEIR CLAIM FOR MONEY DAMAGES AT ANYONE ELSE'S EXPENSE, AND THEY HAVE HAD A FAIR OPPORTUNITY TO SUPPORT THEIR APPEAL. NOW, IT IS DISMISSED. DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 13, 2011 ORDER |
|
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 28, 2011 COURT DISMISSAL |
|
July 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATED 07/29/2011 FROM L. LAVALLEE TO APPELLANTS. AS OF THIS DATE, THE CCP TRANSCRIPT HAS NOT BEEN FILED. THE TRANSCRIPT MUST BE OBTAINED WITHIN 15 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS NOTICE, OR YOUR CASE WILL BE REFERRED TO THE ASSIGNED JUDGE FOR DISMISSAL. DATE DOCKETED: JULY 29, 2011 LETTER |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AS TO PAYMENT FOR A TRANSCRIPT IN A CIVIL APPEAL. THE COURT HAVING CONSIDERED THE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND THE AFFIDAVIT FILED IN CONNECTION THEREWITH, IT IS ORDERED THE APPLICATION IS DENIED. APPELLANT MAY NOT HAVE ASSETS, AS SHE CONTENDS. EVEN SO, APPELLANT DOES NOT HAVE A RIGHT TO AN APPEAL IN A CIVIL CASE AT THE TAXPAYERS EXPENSE. WHILE THE COURT IS WAIVING THE FILING FEE, IT WILL NOT PAY FOR A TRANSCRIPT. DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 29, 2011 ORDER |
|
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS **TO PAY FOR CCP TRANSCRIPT TO SUPERIOR COURT (SENT TO SILVERMAN, J. ON 04/25/11) DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 25, 2011 MOTION PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER |
|
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED (OTHER) SERVED SPCA BY LEAVING WITH ANN CAVANAUGH, DIRECTOR ON 4/18/2011 AT 10:31 A.M. DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 26, 2011 WRIT RETURNED (OTHER) |
|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATED 04/14/11 FROM C. BENNETT TO COURT RE: ORDER OF APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS DATE DOCKETED: MAY 6, 2011 LETTER |
|
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE ON S.P.C.A. BY SERVING D.L. GOUGE, JR., ESQUIRE DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 12, 2011 SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF |
|
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE ON COURT OF COMMON PLEAS DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 12, 2011 SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATED 03/28/2011 FROM S. AGNEW TO C. BENNETT. THE PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS HAS BEEN GRANTED BY THE ASSIGNED JUDGE WITH THE PROVISION THAT YOU PAY THE $185.00 FILING FEE IF YOU ARE SUCCESSFUL ON THE PETITION. DATE DOCKETED: APRIL 4, 2011 LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.