Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with CARPENTER JR., WILLIAM C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARPENTER JR., WILLIAM C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 01, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 28, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: CARPENTER, WILLIAM C SO ORDERED (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL) ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 68313008 ORDER |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 27, 2022 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTED BY: AQ TRANSACTION ID: 68302260 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE SETTLED DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 26, 2022 CASE SETTLED |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 2, 2022 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - TRIAL WILL BEGIN ON SEPTEMBER 11, 2023. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON AUGUST 18 , 2023 AT 9:30 A.M. ACCEPTED BY: NEB TRANSACTION ID: 67356782 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 29, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY WALTER J. O'BRIEN ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: NEB TRANSACTION ID: 67272421 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 27, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS' INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT ACCEPTED BY: NEB TRANSACTION ID: 67266012 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 20, 2021 REFERRED TO CASE SCHEDULING |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 18, 2021 DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES EXHIBIT TO DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67175271 ANSWER FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 18, 2021 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67175271 ANSWER |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 14, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF STEPHEN F. DRYDEN, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67162806 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.