Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with 002134 presiding.
Case Number |
Judge002134 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 29, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 23, 2022 ORDER SIGNED BY: JONES, FRANCIS J SO ORDERED (STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, JUDGE SIGNATURE REQUIRED) ACCEPTED BY: NG TRANSACTION ID: 67414364 ORDER |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 22, 2022 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, JUDGE SIGNATURE REQUIRED ACCEPTED BY: TNW TRANSACTION ID: 67406250 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 24, 2021 DEFENDANTS GARBER AND VOLPE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT DEFENDANTS GARBER AND VOLPE'S ANSWER TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT FOR DEFENDANTS GARBER AND VOLPE'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS GARBER AND VOLPE'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND ANSWER TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67118029 ANSWER |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 17, 2021 WRIT RETURNED -ALTERNATE AGENT SERVED 11-09-2021 13:10 MELISSA M VOLPE ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67090199 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 17, 2021 WRIT RETURNED -ALTERNATE AGENT SERVED 11-09-2021 13:09 ISABELLA M GARBER ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67090198 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
WRIT(S) ISSUED ON DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 6, 2021 (2) WRITS ISSUED ON 11-4-2021 FOR NCC SHERIFF CK# 109087 $35.00 ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 67072184 WRIT ISSUED |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 30, 2021 COMPLAINT CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE SUMMONS FOR SERVICE TO THE NEW CASTLE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE RULE 3H STATEMENT PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO FORM 30 INTERROGATORIES ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67054329 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PERSONAL INJURY AUTO DATE DOCKETED: OCTOBER 30, 2021 INIT FILING PERS INJURY AUTO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.