Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Butler, Charles E filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
CategoryAdministrative Agency |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
MANDATE AND RECORD FROM THE SUPREME COURT DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 9, 2021 SUPREME COURT MANDATE ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66909417 MANDATE FROM SUPREME COURT |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 5, 2021 LETTER TO APPELLANT ADVISING THAT THE $100.00 SUPERIOR COURT PREPARATION FEE IS NOW DUE. ACCEPTED BY: BSB TRANSACTION ID: 66391367 LETTER |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 6, 2021 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E COPY OF LETTER CAPTIONED IN THE SUPREME COURT DATED 3-4-21 FROM SENIOR COURT CLERK TO THE PROTHONOTARY, ADVISING THE RECORD IS DUE 3-30-21. ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66390461 LETTER |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE APPEALED TO SUPREME COURT DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 6, 2021 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E COPY OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED IN THE SUPREME COURT ON 3-26-21. ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66390461 CASE APPEALED TO SUPREME COURT |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 22, 2021 COURT DISMISSAL |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 29, 2021 ORDER UPON INITIAL REVIEW OF COMPLAINT, SIGNED BY J. BUTLER ON JANUARY 12, 2021: THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED BECAUSE THE COMPLAINT WAS FACTUALLY FRIVOLOUS, THE COMPLAINT WAS LEGALLY FRIVOLOUS AND IT PLAINLY APPEARS FROM THE FACE OF THE COMPLAINT THAT THE PLAINTIFF IS NOT ENTITLED TO RELIEF. IT IS SO ORDERED. ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66288850 ORDER |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 29, 2021 LETTER TO PETITIONER, SIGNED BY L. GONZALEZ ON JANUARY 26, 2021: YOUR APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS HAS BEEN DENIED, AND YOUR COMPLAINT HAS BEEN DISMISSED PURSUANT TO THE REASONS STATED IN THE ORDER. ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66288850 LETTER |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
IN FORMA PAUPERIS ORDER DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 29, 2021 ORDER ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SIGNED BY J. BUTLER ON JANUARY 12, 2021: THE APPLICATION IS DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66288850 IN FORMA PAUPERIS ORDER |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 23, 2020 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ACCEPTED BY: ELS TRANSACTION ID: 66205625 MOTION PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPER |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING ADMINISTRATIVE AGENCY APPEAL DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 23, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN NCC PROTHONOTARY ON DECEMBER 21, 2020 CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE WRIT EXHIBIT ACCEPTED BY: ELS TRANSACTION ID: 66205625 INIT FILING ADMIN AGENCY APPL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.