Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Butler, Charles E filed a(n) Court Of Common Pleas case in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
CategoryCourt Of Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 1, 2021 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E APPEAL FROM A DECISION OF THE DELAWARE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS - AFFIRMED. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 67129150 ORDER |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMED/ REVERSED IN PART DATE DOCKETED: NOVEMBER 30, 2021 AFFIRMED / REVERSED IN PART |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 2, 2021 CASE WAS SENT UP TO CHAMBERS FOR CEB'S REVIEW AND DECISION ON SEPTEMBER 1, 2021 ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66897854 NOTICE |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2021 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E MEMO FOR REVIEW AND FILE GIVEN TO AMANDA TODAY, 8-31-21 ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 66893672 NOTICE |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
RECORD AND TRANSCRIPT FROM: DATE DOCKETED: SEPTEMBER 1, 2021 RECORDS ONLY ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66893225 RECORD & TRANSCRIPT (LOWER CT) |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
REPLY BRIEF FILED DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 20, 2021 REPLY BRIEF FILED CONVENTIONALY BY PRO SE APPELLANT, WYKEEMA GRIFFIN IN NCC PROTHONOTARY ON AUGUST 18, 2021 ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66863198 REPLY BRIEF FILED |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
BRIEF SCHEDULE FILED AND ISSUED AS FOLLOWS: OPENING BRIEF DUE: ANSWERING BRIEF DUE: REPLY BRIEF DUE: DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 3, 2021 NEW BRIEF SCHEDULE ISSUED WITH A NEW REPLY BRIEF DUE DATE OF AUGUST 13, 2021 - COPY MAILED FIRST CLASS MAIL TO PRO SE APPELLANT ON 8-2-21 ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66815054 BRIEF SCHEDULE FILED |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWERING BRIEF FILED DATE DOCKETED: JULY 31, 2021 ANSWERING BRIEF FILED CONVENTIONALLY BY PRO SE APPELLEE, EDGAR RAMIREZ AT THE NCC PROTHONOTARY ON JULY 29, 2021 ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66811393 ANSWERING BRIEF FILED |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINAL DELINQUENT BRIEF NOTICE SENT DATE DOCKETED: JULY 22, 2021 FINAL DELINQUENT BRIEF NOTICE TO EDGAR RAMIREZ ON JULY 21, 2021. ANSWERING BRIEF WAS DUE JULY 20, 2021 ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66787114 FINAL DELINQUENT BRIEF NOTICE |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 20, 2021 AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF'S OPENING BRIEF FILED CONVENTIONALLY ON JUNE 15, 2021 IN THE NCC PROTHONOTARY ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 66694867 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.