Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jackson, Loretta E, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Barda, Joseph, Dhss, Delaware Spca, in the jurisdiction of New Castle County, DE, . New Castle County, DE Superior Courts with BUTLER, CHARLES E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBUTLER, CHARLES E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 31, 2018 |
CategoryProperty Damage |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew Castle County, DE |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
MANDATE AND RECORD FROM THE SUPREME COURT DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 1, 2019 MANDATE TO CLERK OF COURT BELOW. CASE CLOSED. ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 63310592 MANDATE FROM SUPREME COURT |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DATE DOCKETED: JULY 28, 2018 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E NOTICE OF SUPERIOR COURT LEXIS DOCKET UPLOADED ONTO SUPREME COURT LEXIS DOCKET. ACCEPTED BY: TRANSACTION ID: 62281173 NOTICE |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
COURT DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 22, 2019 COURT DISMISSAL |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE APPEALED TO SUPREME COURT DATE DOCKETED: JULY 14, 2018 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E NOTICE OF APPEAL ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 62236270 CASE APPEALED TO SUPREME COURT |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JULY 14, 2018 ORDER SIGNED BY: BUTLER, CHARLES E LETTER DATED 7-13-18 FROM SENIOR COURT CLERK TO PROTHONOTARY, ADVISING THAT THE RECORD IS DUE 8-6-18. ACCEPTED BY: ERD TRANSACTION ID: 62236350 LETTER |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 13, 2018 ORDER UPON INITIAL REVIEW OF COMPLAINT, SIGNED BY BUTLER, J. ON JUNE 7, 2018: IT IS ORDERED THAT THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED BECAUSE IT PLAINLY APPEARS FROM THE FACE OF THE COMPLAINT THAT THE PLAINTIFF IS NOT ENTITLED TO RELIEF. THE COURT HAS PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED PLAINTIFF'S ACTION ALLEGING MISCONDUCT IN THE DEATH OF THE DOG; C.A. NO. N16C-11-005 CEB. ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 62127048 ORDER |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 13, 2018 LETTER TO APPLICANT, SIGNED BY HEARN, S. ON JUNE 11, 2018: YOUR APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS HAS BEEN GRANTED, BUT YOUR CASE HAS BEEN DISMISSED BY THE ASSIGNED JUDGE PURSUANT TO THE REASONS STATED IN THE ORDER. ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 62127048 LETTER |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
IN FORMA PAUPERIS ORDER DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 13, 2018 ORDER ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SIGNED BY BUTLER, J. ON JUNE 7, 2018: THE APPLICATION IS GRANTED. THE APPLICANT SHALL PAY NO FEES OR COURT COSTS. IT IS SO ORDERED. ACCEPTED BY: ES TRANSACTION ID: 62127048 IN FORMA PAUPERIS ORDER |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING PROPERTY DAMAGE DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 1, 2018 INIT FILING PROPERTY DAMAGE |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 1, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN NCC PROTHONOTARY ON MAY 31, 2018. CIS PRAECIPE PRAECIPE DELAWARE SPCA PRAECIPE DHSS EXHIBIT 1 EXHIBIT 2 EXHIBIT 3 EXHIBIT 4 IN FORMA PAUPERIS CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPEFACE REQUIREMENT AND TYPE-VOLUME LIMITATION CERTIFICATE OF UNKNOWN DEFENDANTS ACCEPTED BY: ARC TRANSACTION ID: 62083788 INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.