Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank,, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brachfeld, Erica L, against Jonathan J Bellusa, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 03, 2008 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time225 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT VACATED |
|
June 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE BY PLAINTIFF - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 6/16/09 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 29 | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FLING COMPLAINT OSC ISSUED |
|
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 11/03/2008 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK, (USA) N.A. FILED Not Applicable |
|
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event | PLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 5/04/09, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 29 | |
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
COLOR OF FILE: GREY Not Applicable |
|
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 29 | |
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE ENTRY COMPLETED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.